IN SB0302 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of charitable organizations. Prohibits a state agency or a state official from imposing on a charitable organization any filing or reporting requirements that are more stringent or burdensome than those imposed by, or authorized under, state or federal law. Provides that this limitation does not apply: (1) to requirements imposed in connection with: (A) state grants or contracts; or (B) fraud investigations; or (2) in connection with an enforcement action against a specific charitable organization.
Title
Regulation of charitable organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Renee Pack [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Law 40 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-21 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-03-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2023-03-20 | House | Representative Pack R added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-14 | House | Representative Miller D added as cosponsor |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2023-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |