IN SB0302 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Indigency determinations. Establishes a procedure for a criminal court to use in determining if a defendant is indigent. Provides that, if a court has ordered a defendant to pay part of the cost of representation, the court shall inquire at sentencing whether the defendant has paid the required amount. Specifies that a court may prorate fines, fees, and court costs based on the person's reasonable ability to pay. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on corrections and criminal code.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indigency determinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-21SenatePublic Law 140
2020-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-02-25HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2020-02-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives DeLaney and Beck
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-01-27SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2020-01-27SenateSenator Young M removed as third author
2020-01-27SenateSenator Randolph removed as second author
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21SenateSenators Freeman and Glick added as coauthors
2020-01-21SenateSenator Young M added as third author
2020-01-14SenateSenator Randolph added as second author
2020-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Tallian

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/302/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/a/6/31a6cdb9/SB0302.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/6/8/49686e83/SB0302.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/e/b/d0eb3385/SB0302.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/c/9/95c9710e/SB0302.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/a/a/72aafafe/SB0302.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/a/f/adafcdde/SB0302.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/c/5/48c5b34a/SB0302.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/b/a/c8ba4ac3/SB0302.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/7/3/6f739f13/SB0302.83_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/9/d/999d4262/SB0302.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/2/c/eb2c2879/SB0302.200_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback