IN SB0301 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
Pending: House Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the cost of projects that the department of natural resources may perform without awarding a public works contract from $75,000 to $150,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources public works projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
2010-01-28 Cosponsor: Rep. Leonard
2010-01-28 House sponsor: Rep. Grubb
2010-01-28 Referred to the House
2010-01-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: Yeas 48 and Nays 0
2010-01-26 Senator Mishler added as second author
2010-01-26 Senator Hume added as coauthor
2010-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-19 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback