IN SB0299 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Annexation of fire protection district territory. Provides the following with regard to certain annexations that include property within a fire protection district (district) for which the annexation ordinance was adopted after December 31, 2020: (1) The annexation is effective at least 30 days after the annexation ordinance is adopted, published, and filed with state and county officials. (Under current law, with certain exceptions, an annexation of property within a district takes effect the second January 1 after the ordinance is adopted and filed with state and county officials.) (2) Exempts the municipality from provisions requiring the municipality to: (A) commence fire protection service to the annexed territory on the ordinance's effective date; and (B) notify the district within 10 days of commencing fire protection service to the annexed territory. Makes stylistic changes.
Title
Annexation of fire protection district territory.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] | Sen. Kevin Boehnlein [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 23 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein added as third author |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |