IN SB0299 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Offenses involving unmanned aerial vehicles. Amends the definition of "unmanned aerial vehicle" to specify that the term includes: (1) an unmanned aircraft and an unmanned aircraft system; and (2) a small unmanned aircraft and a small unmanned aircraft system; all as defined in federal law. Creates the following new criminal offenses involving the use of an unmanned aerial vehicle as Class A misdemeanors: (1) Sex offender unmanned aerial vehicle offense. (2) Public safety remote aerial interference. (3) Remote aerial voyeurism. (4) Remote aerial harassment. Provides that the offenses are Level 6 felonies if the accused person has a prior unrelated
Title
Offenses involving unmanned aerial vehicles. Amends the definition of "unmanned aerial vehicle" to specify that the term includes: (1) an unmanned aircraft and an unmanned aircraft system; and (2) a small unmanned aircraft and a small unmanned aircraft system; all as defined in federal law. Creates the following new criminal offenses involving the use of an unmanned aerial vehicle as Class A misdemeanors: (1) Sex offender unmanned aerial vehicle offense. (2) Public safety remote aerial interference. (3) Remote aerial voyeurism. (4) Remote aerial harassment. Provides that the offenses are Level 6 felonies if the accused person has a prior unrelated
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 107 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 448: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |