IN SB0295 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various education matters. Extends the date by which public schools, including charter schools, and accredited nonpublic schools must provide age appropriate research and evidence based or research or evidence based instruction on child abuse and child sexual abuse to students. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2021, the department of workforce development must implement a new Indiana career explorer program (program). Establishes requirements for the program. Requires the department of workforce development to issue, not later than December 31, 2020, a request for proposals regarding the part of the program that includes educational and career assessments or tools. Amends grade levels to which certain career exploration models and career preparation models apply. Removes provisions regarding a pilot program for instruction in and use of the Indiana career explorer program and standards. Requires the department of education (department) to prepare and submit an annual report to the state board of education, general assembly, and commission for higher education regarding certain computer science metrics. Requires the department to post the report on its Internet web site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenatePublic Law 76
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 388: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 384: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: DeVon, Jordan, Clere, DeLaney, Pfaff and Smith V
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Behning and Goodin
2020-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Rogers, Stoops and Crane
2020-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
2020-03-03SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-03SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-02HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2020-03-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 88, nays 0
2020-02-27HouseAmendment #3 (Dvorak) failed; voice vote
2020-02-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 48, nays 1
2020-02-03SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Crane added as third author
2020-01-30SenateSenator Rogers added as second author
2020-01-30SenateSenator Crane removed as second author
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Crane added as second author
2020-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/295/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/6/a/736a3356/SB0295.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/c/e/61ce639d/SB0295.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/e/7/afe74082/SB0295.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/5/d/425dcb9c/SB0295.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/4/3/274332e8/SB0295.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/d/a/80da2a61/SB0295.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/8/1/17815061/SB0295.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/d/8/e7d8a941/SB0295.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/5/a/bd5a34b1/SB0295.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/f/6/9ef6f8ca/SB0295.158_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/4/e/3e4edf2d/SB0295.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/1/3/ce132539/SB0295.237_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/0/6/de0657f2/SB0295.384_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/2/7/7a27d169/SB0295.388_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback