IN SB0295 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Enforcement of vehicle weight restrictions. Prohibits the bureau of motor vehicles from assessing points under the point system for violations after December 31, 2015, of commercial weight limitations. Provides that points assessed after December 31, 2015, for such violations are null and void.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enforcement of vehicle weight restrictions. Prohibits the bureau of motor vehicles from assessing points under the point system for violations after December 31, 2015, of commercial weight limitations. Provides that points assessed after December 31, 2015, for such violations are null and void.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateCosponsor: Representative Ziemke
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frye R
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-02-21SenateSenator Niezgodski added as third author
2017-02-21SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2017-01-26SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback