IN SB0293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Manufactured home dealers. Amends the definition of "major component parts" to include a catalytic converter. Provides certain requirements for an automotive salvage recycler who is purchasing catalytic converters. Defines "manufactured home dealer" (dealer). Creates a new chapter concerning the licensing of dealers. Provides that a dealer may hold an offsite sale under certain conditions. Requires certain entities to obtain liability insurance coverage in certain amounts. Provides that it is an unfair practice to sell, exchange, or transfer a salvage vehicle without written disclosure. Provides that a dealer is exempt from certain mailing address requirements. Requires that a dealer must remain in good standing with the state department of health while holding a license.
Title
Manufactured home dealers.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 20 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | House | Representatives Jordan and Morris added as cosponsors |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 88, nays 3 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as third author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |