IN SB0293 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Government accounting study committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government accounting study committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 121
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 455: yeas 49, nays 0
2013-04-03SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 386: yeas 95, nays 0
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 1 (Moed), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-28HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor
2013-03-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseRepresentative Koch added as cosponsor
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
2013-02-04SenateSenator Holdman added as coauthor
2013-02-04SenateSenators Merritt, Kruse and Smith added as coauthors
2013-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Turner
2013-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-01-31SenateAmendment 1 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote
2013-01-31SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-28SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor
2013-01-28SenateSenator Taylor added as third author
2013-01-28SenateSenator Walker added as second author
2013-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Pete Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback