IN SB0292 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Land banks. Requires a county executive to, before February 1, 2023, and by February 1 each year thereafter, provide a land bank in the county with a list of tracts located in the territory of the land bank that: (1) are delinquent on property taxes; and (2) have been offered for public sale at least two times and remain unsold; on an annual basis. Allows the county executive to transfer its interest in a tract on the list to a land bank if requested by the land bank not later than 90 days after it receives the list.
Title
Land banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative May added as cosponsor |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Errington and Bauer M |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senators Pol and Bohacek added as coauthors |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Randolph and Tomes added as coauthors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Lanane) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Lanane |