IN SB0292 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits, with certain exceptions, a political subdivision from regulating: (1) firearms, ammunition, and firearm accessories; (2) the ownership, possession, carrying, transportation, registration, transfer, and storage of firearms, ammunition, and firearm accessories; and (3) commerce in and taxation of firearms, firearm ammunition, and firearm accessories. Allows a person to file an action against a political subdivision if the person is adversely affected by an ordinance, a measure, an enactment, a rule, or a policy of the political subdivision that violates the law. Repeals a conflicting statute concerning local regulation of firearms.
Title
Preemption of local firearm regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 3 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 152 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 730: yeas 70, nays 24 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 513: yeas 40, nays 10 | |
2011-04-29 | Senator Hershman added as coauthor | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-21 | House advisors appointed: Speedy, Eberhart and Moses | |
2011-04-21 | House conferees appointed: Torr and Goodin | |
2011-04-19 | Senate advisors appointed: Tomes, Taylor, Lanane and Waltz | |
2011-04-19 | Senate conferees appointed: Hershman and Hume | |
2011-04-19 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 548: yeas 77, nays 21 | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment 2 (Speedy), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-15 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-02-14 | Cosponsors: Reps. Eberhart, Koch, VanNatter and Goodin | |
2011-02-14 | House sponsor: Rep. Speedy | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 38 and nays 12 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed; Roll Call 107: yeas 9, nays 40 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed; Roll Call 106: yeas 9, nays 39 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment 6 (Tomes), prevailed; | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-08 | Senator Kruse added as coauthor | |
2011-02-08 | Senator Nugent added as second author | |
2011-02-08 | Senator Nugent removed as coauthor | |
2011-01-27 | Senator Waterman added as coauthor | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Steele added as coauthor | |
2011-01-13 | Senators Nugent, Smith, Schneider, Banks and Waltz added as coauthors | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Senator Tomes |