IN SB0291 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that "law enforcement agency", for purposes of receiving information concerning a violation of the human trafficking statute, includes the attorney general and an agency whose principal function is the apprehension of criminal offenders. Specifies that the attorney general has the same authority as a law enforcement agency to access and maintain information regarding a violation of the human trafficking statute. Permits the attorney general to assist with the investigation and prosecution of a violation of the human trafficking statute.
Title
Human trafficking investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 029102 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 029101 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 029102 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 029101 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Public Law 162 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 340: yeas 92 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative Riecken added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative McNamara added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Cox added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third author. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report; do pass, adopted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waterman. |