IN SB0290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Requires the department of education (department) to establish a career coaching pilot program to award grants to school corporations to establish career coaching programs for students of the school corporation. Beginning July 1, 2022, requires the department to annually submit a report to the general assembly in an electronic format that provides certain information concerning high school graduation waiver rates and graduation pathways and to post the report on the department's Internet web site. Provides that, if the total amount of state tuition support that a school corporation receives or will receive during a school year decreases under the student instructional day reduction of tuition support provision by an amount that is equal to or more than $250,000 from the amount the school corporation would otherwise be eligible to receive during the school year, the budget committee shall review the amount of and the reason for the decrease before the implementation of the decrease. Provides that, if an adjustment by the state board of education (state board) of the count of enrolled eligible pupils for one or more school corporations would increase or decrease the total distribution of state tuition support in an amount that is equal to or more than $250,000, the adjustment must be reviewed by the budget committee before the state board may adjust the enrollment count. Provides that, if the state board determines that extreme patterns of certain conditions on the count day or the subsequent adjustment date cause the enrollment to be unrepresentative of the enrollment of one or more school corporations by a count of eligible pupils that would increase or decrease the total distribution of state tuition support in an amount that is equal to or more than $250,000 as a result of changing the count day, the state board may designate another day for determining the enrollment of the one or more school corporations after review by the budget committee. Provides that the state board shall assign to a school or school corporation (including adult high schools) a "null" or "no letter grade" for the 2021-2022 school year.
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 130 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 375: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 357: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Davis, Cook, Klinker and Pfaff |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse and Qaddoura |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Jordan |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |