IN SB0290 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Military trained emergency medical providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military trained emergency medical providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 16
2013-04-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-03-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-19SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-11HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 95, nays 0
2013-03-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-05HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-04HouseRepresentatives Arnold and Zent added as cosponsors
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2013-02-11SenateSenators Leising and Glick added as coauthors
2013-02-11SenateCosponsor: Rep. Frye
2013-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Forestal
2013-02-11SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 48 and nays 0
2013-02-07SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2013-02-07SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-05SenateSenators Grooms and Merritt added as coauthors
2013-02-05SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-10SenateSenator Steele added as coauthor
2013-01-10SenateSenator Wyss added as second author
2013-01-10SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Hume

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback