IN SB0290 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the requirement that certain offenders placed on home detention be subject to constant supervision does not apply, with certain exceptions, if the supervising department or program's inability to maintain constant supervision is solely because electronic monitoring is not possible in certain locations in the county due to the unavailability of an appropriate telecommunications infrastructure. Specifies that the requirement that a contract agency supervising an offender on home detention notify authorities within one hour of a violation of the conditions of home detention does not apply, with certain exceptions, if the late notification occurs solely because electronic monitoring is not possible in certain locations in the county due to the unavailability of an appropriate telecommunications infrastructure and the contract agency notifies the authorities as soon as possible after learning of the violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2010-01-28 Cosponsor: Rep. Foley
2010-01-28 House sponsor: Rep. Koch
2010-01-28 Referred to the House
2010-01-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: Yeas 48 and Nays 0
2010-01-26 Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed;
2010-01-26 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-26 Senator Hume added as coauthor
2010-01-26 Senator Waterman added as second author
2010-01-21 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback