IN SB0289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - House advisors appointed: Engleman, Lauer, Young J, Boy, Jackson and Summers
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Family and juvenile law matters. Specifies that an "adult" is: (1) a person at least eighteen years of age; or (2) a: (A) married minor who is at least sixteen years of age; or (B) minor that has been completely emancipated by a court; for the purpose of marriage. Raises the minimum age to marry from 15 years of age to 16 years of age. Provides that an individual 16 years of age may marry only if: (1) the individual's intended spouse is not more than four years older than the individual; (2) a juvenile court has issued an order allowing the individual to marry; and (3) the individual: (A) completes any premarital counseling required under the order; (B) applies for a marriage license not earlier than 15 days after the order is issued; and (C) includes a certified copy of the order with the individual's application for a marriage license. Repeals provisions requiring an individual less than 18 years of age to obtain consent to marry from the individual's parent or guardian. Specifies a process an individual 16 years of age must follow to petition a juvenile court for an order allowing the individual to marry, and specifies conditions necessary for approval of the petition and conditions requiring denial of the petition. Provides that a court that issues an order allowing an individual 16 years of age to marry must also issue an order completely emancipating the individual. Amends the list of records or documents an individual may submit to a court clerk as proof of the individual's date of birth for purposes of applying for a marriage license. Provides that a relocating individual is not required to file a notice of intent to move with the clerk of the court for purposes of custody, parenting time, or grandparent visitation if: (1) the relocation has been addressed by a prior court order; or (2) the relocation will: (A) result in a decrease in the distance between the relocating individual's residence and the nonrelocating individual's residence; or (B) result in an increase of not more than 20 miles in the distance between the relocating individual's residence and the nonrelocating individual's residence. Provides that certain individuals can begin work at a child caring institution, group home, or child placing agency if: (1) the individual's: (A) in-state child protection index check; (B) national sex offender registry check; (C) in-state local law enforcement records check; and (D) fingerprint based check of national crime information data bases; have been completed; (2) the individual's: (A) out-of-state child abuse registry check; and (B) out-of-state local law enforcement records check; have been requested; and (3) the individual completes an attestation, under penalty of perjury, disclosing: (A) any abuse or neglect complaints made against the individual with the child welfare agency of a state other than Indiana in which the individual resided within the five years preceding the date of the attestation; and (B) any contact the individual had with a law enforcement agency in connection with the individual's suspected or alleged commission of a crime in a state other than Indiana in which the individual resided within the five years preceding the date of the attestation. Provides that before the individual's out-of-state abuse registry check and out-of-state local law enforcement records check have been completed, the individual's employment must be limited to employment training during which: (1) the individual does not have direct contact with a child; and (B) the individual is accompanied by an employee who meets certain requirements. Amends the law regarding petitions by minors for emancipation as follows: (1) Provides that a court hearing a minor's petition for emancipation must appoint a guardian ad litem for the minor. (2) Provides that the guardian ad litem shall investigate the statements contained in the minor's petition and file a report of the investigation with the court. (3) Provides that a court may grant a minor's petition for emancipation only if the court finds that emancipation is in the child's best interests. (4) Provides that if the court completely emancipates the child: (A) the child has all the rights and responsibilities of an adult; and (B) the emancipation order may not specify terms of emancipation. Provides that an emancipated child remains subject to: (1) Indiana law concerning minimum age for marriage; and (2) other specific constitutional and statutory age requirements applicable to the emancipated child because of the emancipated child's age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family and juvenile law matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Engleman, Lauer, Young J, Boy, Jackson and Summers
2020-03-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lindauer and Wright
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Walker, Lanane and Houchin
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Grooms and Ford J.D.
2020-03-05SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-04SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 284: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-03-02HouseAmendment #3 (Engleman) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Mayfield, Cook, DeVon
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lindauer
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-30SenateSenators Houchin and Donato added as coauthors
2020-01-30SenateSenator Walker added as second author
2020-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2020-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Grooms

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/289/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/b/f/69bf78bf/SB0289.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/b/1/16b1528b/SB0289.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/f/2/15f2f44d/SB0289.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/8/c/f98c58ce/SB0289.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/2/1/cb21af16/SB0289.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/7/3/8073db73/SB0289.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/3/a/f33af17c/SB0289.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/0/8/f20851b6/SB0289.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/e/6/08e65afc/SB0289.05.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/b/9/1db9d02a/SB0289.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/e/8/03e8160c/SB0289.156_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/5/2/7c526618/SB0289.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/0/9/290997bc/SB0289.284_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback