IN SB0289 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reporting on worker misclassification. Requires the department of state revenue, the state department of labor, the worker's compensation board of Indiana, and the department of workforce development to report before November 1 of each year for three years, beginning November 1, 2019, to the interim study committee on employment and labor for the immediately preceding state fiscal year: (1) the number of employers that each department or the board determined during the immediately preceding state fiscal year improperly classified at least one worker as an independent contractor; (2) the total number of improperly classified workers employed by those employers; (3) the department's or board's calculation of actual revenue not collected or the additional costs to the state that the department or board attributes to the improperly classified workers; (4) the amount of the penalties and interest assessed against those employers by each department or the board, and the amount of the penalties and interest assessed that has been collected; and (5) the classification criteria used by the department to classify workers. Requires that the reports include only information in the form of aggregate statistics and not include information that can be used to identify specific employers or workers. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the topic of uniformity in definitions across the Indiana Code for the terms "employee" and "independent contractor".
Title
Reporting on worker misclassification. Requires the department of state revenue, the state department of labor, the worker's compensation board of Indiana, and the department of workforce development to report before November 1 of each year for three years, beginning November 1, 2019, to the interim study committee on employment and labor for the immediately preceding state fiscal year: (1) the number of employers that each department or the board determined during the immediately preceding state fiscal year improperly classified at least one worker as an independent contractor; (2) the total number of improperly classified workers employed by those employers; (3) the department's or board's calculation of actual revenue not collected or the additional costs to the state that the department or board attributes to the improperly classified workers; (4) the amount of the penalties and interest assessed against those employers by each department or the board, and the amount of the penalties and interest assessed that has been collected; and (5) the classification criteria used by the department to classify workers. Requires that the reports include only information in the form of aggregate statistics and not include information that can be used to identify specific employers or workers. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the topic of uniformity in definitions across the Indiana Code for the terms "employee" and "independent contractor".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Morris, Beck and Deal |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Bacon |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Niezgodski) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senators Walker, Tallian, Doriot, Ford J.D. added as coauthors |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second author |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niezgodski |