IN SB0289 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confidential victim services requests. Permits, for purposes of the public records law, a law enforcement agency to share certain information with a crime victim advocate without the agency losing the discretion to keep this information confidential from other persons requesting records.
Title
Confidential victim services requests. Permits, for purposes of the public records law, a law enforcement agency to share certain information with a crime victim advocate without the agency losing the discretion to keep this information confidential from other persons requesting records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Public Law 9 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representatives Lawson, Hale, Macer added as cosponsors |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative McNamara added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Arnold J |