IN SB0286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Credit time. Permits a person placed on pretrial home detention to earn accrued time and good time credit in the same manner as other persons on home detention, but provides that specified misconduct will result in the deprivation of all credit time earned on pretrial home detention. Amends the sentencing guidelines for a habitual offender.
Title
Credit time.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Rodney Pol [D] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Law 37 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senator Pol added as coauthor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 321: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2023-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senators Garten and Raatz added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senators Sandlin and Glick added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |