IN SB0285 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the topic of a unit's use of law enforcement to respond to a mass traffic obstruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the topic of a unit's use of law enforcement to respond to a mass traffic obstruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Zay added as second author
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Borders
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 34, nays 16
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback