IN SB0285 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all civil taxing units subject to nonbinding review to file the information required for the nonbinding review with the county fiscal body on or before September 1 of each year. Requires a county fiscal body to complete the reviews and issue nonbinding recommendations on or before October 1 of each year. Requires a taxing unit that is subject to binding review to submit its budget and levies for final approval on or before September 1 of each year. Requires a taxing unit submitting its budget and tax levies for either nonbinding review or final approval to also submit to the reviewing body a copy of the notice of budget estimates and tax levies published by the taxing unit. Provides that a political subdivision that is required to submit its proposed budget and property tax levy for final approval may make an additional appropriation only if the additional appropriation is also approved by the body that approved the political subdivision's proposed budget and property tax levy. Authorizes the department of local government finance (DLGF) to establish a three year pilot program concerning nonbinding review of budgets, property tax rates, and property tax levies. Provides that for a county to be eligible for designation as a pilot county, the county fiscal body must adopt a resolution and submit an application to the DLGF. Allows the DLGF to designate not more than three counties as pilot counties. Specifies that the following apply in 2013 and thereafter in a pilot county: (1) Each taxing unit in the pilot county must file with the DLGF the taxing unit's proposed budgets, property tax rates, and property tax levies. (2) When formulating the taxing unit's estimated budget, property tax rate, and property tax levy, each taxing unit shall consider estimated consequences of the circuit breaker property tax credits. (3) The DLGF shall prepare an analysis of the proposed budgets, property tax rates, and property tax levies submitted by taxing units in the pilot county and provide the analysis to the county fiscal body and to the fiscal body of each taxing unit in the pilot county. (4) Upon request by the county fiscal body, representatives of the DLGF shall appear before the county fiscal body to review the analysis. (5) The county fiscal body shall review the proposed budgets, property tax rates, and property tax levies of each taxing unit in the county and the total tax rate of each taxing district in the county, and shall issue a nonbinding recommendation to each taxing unit.
Title
Review of local government budgets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Steuerwald | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Thompson | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 46 and nays 4 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-05 | Authored by Senator Lawson |