IN SB0284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - SB 284 Amendment #6 (Battles), failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - SB 284 Amendment #6 (Battles), failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the date, from August 15 to 14 days before the first day a teacher is required to report for duty, after which a contract entered into between a school corporation and a teacher is void if at the time of signing the contract the teacher is bound by a previous contract, unless the teacher provides a 30 day written notice to the first employer or the first employer releases the teacher from the previous contract. Provides that a transition to teaching program participant may obtain a license to teach in prekindergarten if the participant meets certain requirements. Provides that a school corporation may include and account for proceeds from rental income, or earnings generated by other corporation activities, in separate funds apart from the general fund. Provides that money received from the proceeds of rental income, or earnings generated by other corporation activities, may be disbursed without appropriation. Provides that if the school is closed on a non instructional day in which the teacher is required to work or teacher professional development training or education is provided and the work day or teacher professional development training or education is rescheduled, each teacher shall work on that rescheduled day without additional compensation. Provides that a district wide or school wide committee that has teacher members who are members of the exclusive representative and teacher members who are not members of the exclusive representative may address discussion topics subject to bargaining. Provides that a provision relating to local salary scale increases applies upon the expiration of a contract or part of a contract in existence on July 1, 2012. Provides the reimbursement of a mediator in a collective bargaining proceeding. Provides that Indiana
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Rep. Kreg Battles [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 028402 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 028401 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 028402 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 028401 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | SB 284 Amendment #6 (Battles), failed. |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 284 Amendment #4 (Smith, V.), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 284 Amendment #5 (Smith, V.), failed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 284 Amendment #2 (Behning), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 284 Amendment #1 (Behning), prevailed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Battles added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Thompson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Rhoads added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 172: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms. |