IN SB0284 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Annexation by town outside city boundaries.
Title
Annexation by town outside city boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Mahan |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Cherry |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 43 and nays 6 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |