IN SB0282 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Spay-neuter program. Provides for the state board of animal health (board) to administer forfeited deposits held by animal care facilities for spay-neuter procedures. (Current law provides for the bureau of motor vehicles to administer the forfeited deposits.) Establishes the spay-neuter program beginning July 1, 2020. Establishes the spay-neuter trust fund. Provides that the board administers the program and the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spay-neuter program. Provides for the state board of animal health (board) to administer forfeited deposits held by animal care facilities for spay-neuter procedures. (Current law provides for the bureau of motor vehicles to administer the forfeited deposits.) Establishes the spay-neuter program beginning July 1, 2020. Establishes the spay-neuter trust fund. Provides that the board administers the program and the fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-03-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-13HouseRepresentative Lawson added as cosponsor
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2017-02-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-01-30SenateCosponsors: Representatives Cherry and Lehe
2017-01-30SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Baird
2017-01-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-01-26SenateAmendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-26SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-26SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-01-23SenateSenator Zay added as second author
2017-01-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Messmer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/282/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/c/e/02ce3af4/SB0282.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/f/7/caf79cb6/SB0282.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/8/6/05867034/SB0282.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/4/b/c64bcdd8/SB0282.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/f/d/7efd329f/SB0282.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/7/5/5e751977/SB0282.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/f/e/b8feb367/SB0282.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/b/8/67b8fc25/SB0282.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/7/8/3d78788f/SB0282.40.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/f/b/3ffb554e/SB0282.03.ENGS.01.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback