IN SB0280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Over 65 property tax deduction. Increases the deduction limitation on the assessed value of an individual's real property, or mobile home or manufactured home which is not assessed as real property, if the individual is a disabled veteran or is at least 65 years of age on or before December 31 of the calendar year preceding the year in which the deduction is claimed. Increases the amount of the deduction for those individuals. Increases the adjusted gross income limitation for individuals that are at least 65 years of age.
Title
Over 65 property tax deduction. Increases the deduction limitation on the assessed value of an individual's real property, or mobile home or manufactured home which is not assessed as real property, if the individual is a disabled veteran or is at least 65 years of age on or before December 31 of the calendar year preceding the year in which the deduction is claimed. Increases the amount of the deduction for those individuals. Increases the adjusted gross income limitation for individuals that are at least 65 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 114 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 521: yeas 44, nays 2 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 435: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Representative Miller added as cosponsor |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Bartels and Manning |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davisson |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as third author |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second author |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |