IN SB0279 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Nonnamed parties in foreclosure actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonnamed parties in foreclosure actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 189
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 479: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-04-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-02-19SenateSenator Steele added as coauthor
2013-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald
2013-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 48 and nays 1
2013-02-18SenateAmendment 1 (Zakas), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-14SenateSenator Lanane added as second author
2013-02-14SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2013-02-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback