IN SB0278 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Nonprofit corporations. Provides that the contents of an investigative demand issued by the attorney general are to be kept confidential. Defines charitable organization. Expands the definition of "public benefit corporation" to include a domestic corporation that serves a public benefit with an operating budget that is supported by public funds or authorized to spend public funds in furtherance of its mission. Provides that a court may dissolve a corporation under certain circumstances. Specifies procedural requirements that the attorney general must take before petitioning the court for dissolution of a corporation for certain reasons. Provides exceptions. Allows the attorney general to petition a court for additional remedies against a corporation, in addition to or as an alternative dissolution, for certain violations. Provides that upon a showing of reasonable cause, a court may appoint a receiver to manage a corporation under certain circumstances. Requires a corporation to keep certain records for at least three years. Allows the attorney general to inspect records of certain corporations. Prohibits a state agency from imposing a filing or reporting requirement on a charitable organization that is more burdensome than Indiana law allows. Provides exceptions. Allows the attorney general to take certain actions if the attorney general finds that a corporation has failed to comply with certain record requirements. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonprofit corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2023-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Jeter
2023-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 49, nays 0
2023-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2023-02-27SenateAmendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
2023-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2023-02-20SenateSenator Johnson added as second author
2023-02-16SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2023-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Freeman

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback