IN SB0276 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Powers of guardian after death. Authorizes certain guardians to make certain arrangements and control the disposition of a decedent's body subsequent to the death of a protected person. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Powers of guardian after death.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Law 26 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2021-03-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Hatfield and Cook |
2021-02-22 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Lanane) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Lanane |