IN SB0276 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Representatives Lehman, Siegrist, Schaibley added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prekindergarten education. Provides that, after June 30, 2017, the early education grant pilot program (pilot program) includes eligible providers in any county in Indiana. Adds additional requirements for an eligible provider to participate in the pilot program. Adds additional requirements for an eligible child to qualify for or receive a grant under the pilot program. Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) may award a grant to a potential eligible provider or existing eligible provider for an expansion plan if certain requirements are met. Requires a potential eligible provider or existing eligible provider to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prekindergarten education. Provides that, after June 30, 2017, the early education grant pilot program (pilot program) includes eligible providers in any county in Indiana. Adds additional requirements for an eligible provider to participate in the pilot program. Adds additional requirements for an eligible child to qualify for or receive a grant under the pilot program. Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) may award a grant to a potential eligible provider or existing eligible provider for an expansion plan if certain requirements are met. Requires a potential eligible provider or existing eligible provider to

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Breaux) failed (Y: 8 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed (Y: 8 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseRepresentatives Lehman, Siegrist, Schaibley added as cosponsors
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 41, nays 9
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #5 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 188: yeas 8, nays 41
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #4 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 187: yeas 9, nays 40
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 186: yeas 8, nays 41
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-30SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSenator Freeman added as coauthor
2017-01-26SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2017-01-23SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-01-17SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
2017-01-17SenateSenator Head added as third author
2017-01-17SenateSenator Bassler added as second author
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/276/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/5/a/ff5adc09/SB0276.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/6/9/20691fc8/SB0276.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/e/1/02e10642/SB0276.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/8/c/6c8cbf9f/SB0276.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/4/e/f74e2dae/SB0276.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/3/4/373418b0/SB0276.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/a/0/08a099ff/SB0276.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/9/4/1b941828/SB0276.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/8/3/2f8337eb/SB0276.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/6/a/636aa057/SB0276.186.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/b/b/f7bb061e/SB0276.187.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/9/1/309172e2/SB0276.188.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/6/4/03646be6/SB0276.222.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback