IN SB0276 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each school corporation to offer music classes, including music ensembles, as part of the school corporation's curriculum.
Title
Music courses in school curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Rep. Kreg Battles [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] |
Rep. Rhonda Rhoads [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 027601 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 027601 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Rhoads added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Behning added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Battles added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Torr added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 169: yeas 40 and nays 8 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second author. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse. |