IN SB0275 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates, after June 30, 2014, the license for real estate salespersons and the designation of principal real estate brokers. Prohibits, after June 30, 2014, an individual who holds a salesperson's license from performing certain acts as a salesperson without obtaining a broker's license. Establishes, for individuals who hold a salesperson's license on or after June 30, 2012, certain requirements to obtain a broker's license. Requires, after June 30, 2014, a person to meet certain requirements before the person may become a managing broker. Changes the appointment of members to the real estate education advisory council. Provides that broker's licences are issued for three years. (Currently licenses are issued for two years.) Revises education and continuing education requirements. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate brokers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2012-03-08 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2012-03-01 Senator Alting added as coauthor
2012-03-01 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 306: yeas 45, nays 2
2012-02-28 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2012-02-21 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 94, nays 0
2012-02-20 Representatives Morris and Riecken added as cosponsors
2012-02-20 Amendment 2 (Davis), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-20 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2012-01-31 Cosponsor: Rep. Clere
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Davis
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 48 and nays 2
2012-01-30 Senator Broden added as coauthor
2012-01-30 Amendment 2 (Merritt), prevailed; voice vote
2012-01-30 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback