IN SB0273 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Professions and occupations.
Title
Professions and occupations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Clere), failed (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Clere), failed (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 544: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 615: yeas 82, nays 4 |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Bacon, Crouch, Frizzell and Bauer |
2013-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Clere and C. Brown |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Bray and Breaux |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Pat Miller and Stoops |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | Representatives C. Brown and Frizzell added as cosponsors |
2013-04-15 | House | Amendment 3 ( Clere) and prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed; Roll Call 491: yeas 82, nays 9 |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment 2 (Crouch), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment 1 (Clere), failed; Roll Call 469: yeas 31, nays 63 |
2013-04-11 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Clere |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 47 and nays 3 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pat Miller |