IN SB0272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Third reading: Failed for lack of constitutional majority Roll Call 168: yeas 25 and nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Third reading: Failed for lack of constitutional majority Roll Call 168: yeas 25 and nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a person who holds an alcohol permit for an establishment that provides adult entertainment to: (1) require adult performers to provide proof of age and legal residency; (2) have a policy requiring all employees, including adult performers, to notify the owner if a patron, while on the premises of the adult entertainment establishment, offers the employee money in exchange for sexual favors; and (3) require an adult performer to provide an affidavit to the owner that the performer has not been convicted of certain offenses. Permits the alcohol and tobacco commission to suspend, revoke, or refuse to renew the alcohol permit of the owner of an establishment providing adult entertainment if: (1) the owner does not comply with the proof of age, legal residency and affidavit requirements; (2) the owner does not have a policy requiring notification of unlawful solicitation; or (3) a performer commits certain offenses on the premises and the owner fails to terminate the employee or contact law enforcement.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 027201 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 027201 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Failed for lack of constitutional majority Roll Call 168: yeas 25 and nays 22 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 272 Amendment #1 (Buck), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as third author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reassigned to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck. |