IN SB0271 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
E-liquid container labeling. Eliminates a state requirement that an e-liquid manufacturer or a closed system vapor product manufacturer include certain information on an e-liquid container. Removes a duplicative provision that requires the label of an e-liquid container to indicate if the product contains nicotine.
Title
E-liquid container labeling. Eliminates a state requirement that an e-liquid manufacturer or a closed system vapor product manufacturer include certain information on an e-liquid container. Removes a duplicative provision that requires the label of an e-liquid container to indicate if the product contains nicotine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Law 17 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-14 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |