IN SB0270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State settlement agreements. Provides that neither a unit nor a school corporation may settle a claim by agreeing to: (1) adopt, refuse to adopt, or refuse to enforce an ordinance or policy; or (2) the terms of an injunction, restraining order, or consent decree; without providing the attorney general an opportunity to intervene. Requires the court to certify such a case to the attorney general to provide the attorney general an opportunity to intervene. Provides that the attorney general may present evidence that relates to the state's interest in the outcome of the action, and arguments on the state's interest
Title
State settlement agreements. Provides that neither a unit nor a school corporation may settle a claim by agreeing to: (1) adopt, refuse to adopt, or refuse to enforce an ordinance or policy; or (2) the terms of an injunction, restraining order, or consent decree; without providing the attorney general an opportunity to intervene. Requires the court to certify such a case to the attorney general to provide the attorney general an opportunity to intervene. Provides that the attorney general may present evidence that relates to the state's interest in the outcome of the action, and arguments on the state's interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 42, nays 6 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |