IN SB0269 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 229: yeas 17, nays 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Civics test as graduation requirement. Provides that, beginning with the 2016-2017 school year, an individual must obtain a satisfactory score on the United States Civics Test, administered by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to each applicant for United States citizenship, before: (1) graduating from a public high school or an accredited nonpublic high school that participates in the choice scholarship program; or (2) obtaining a high school equivalency certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civics test as graduation requirement. Provides that, beginning with the 2016-2017 school year, an individual must obtain a satisfactory score on the United States Civics Test, administered by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to each applicant for United States citizenship, before: (1) graduating from a public high school or an accredited nonpublic high school that participates in the choice scholarship program; or (2) obtaining a high school equivalency certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 229: yeas 17, nays 33
2015-02-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 35(c); technical correction committee report adopted deleting amendment 269-01 and substituting amendment 269-02 therefor in order to correct a clerical error
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Lanane) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations
2015-01-15SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2015-01-07SenateSenator Smith added as second author
2015-01-07SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/269/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/6/c/4c6c0e56/SB0269.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/7/3/1973a96b/SB0269.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/7/6/b576c1d7/SB0269.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/8/d/088ded7a/SB0269.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/7/4/95742f7e/SB0269.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/0/e/a00e3f73/SB0269.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/7/f/767fa271/SB0269.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/9/2/1a92bde8/SB0269.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/a/1/f9a1ee29/SB0269.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/c/a/87ca3d21/SB0269.229.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback