IN SB0268 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Expiration of contact preference forms. Allows the contact preference form of a birth parent to expire on the birth parent's death. Eliminates the use of contact preference forms for adoptions finalized after June 30, 2021. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expiration of contact preference forms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 27, nays 20
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenator Taylor G added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenator Ford Jon added as third author
2021-01-28SenateSenator Freeman added as second author
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/268/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/c/a/14caf645/SB0268.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/9/4/4b94c725/SB0268.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/2/2/3522b458/SB0268.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/0/6/a4064d97/SB0268.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/b/1/27b1a396/SB0268.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/b/0/a8b01977/SB0268.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/e/6/32e688a2/SB0268.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/a/8/a0a84d79/SB0268.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/1/0/9e10048a/SB0268.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/5/c/325c9bbb/SB0268.55_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback