IN SB0266 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes certain references to obsolete entities in codified noncode transitional provisions relating to the creation of the Indiana finance authority. Repeals a codified noncode statute relating to enforcement of child support orders that was held unconstitutional by the Indiana court of appeals. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)
Title
Noncode statutes project trailer provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 39 | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 435: yeas 84, nays 3 | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsor: Rep. Bartlett | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2011-02-21 | Senator Delph added as second author | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Holdman added as first author | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Long removed as first author | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Senator Long |