IN SB0265 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "metropolitan campus". Requires the commission for higher education to designate Indiana University - Purdue University Fort Wayne as a metropolitan campus. Creates an advisory board for a metropolitan campus. Requires a governance agreement or an operational contract for a metropolitan campus to contain certain provisions.
Title
Metropolitan campus governance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 026501 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Banks, Kruse. |