IN SB0264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Second reading: engrossed.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Second reading: engrossed.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a public school teacher who has received a designation of "highly effective" or "effective" and who applies to work and is subsequently employed in a public school or charter school that meets certain criteria is eligible to receive a stipend if an appropriation is made to provide stipends.
Title
Choices for teachers program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 026402 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 026401 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 026401 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Huston added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 167: yeas 34 and nays 14 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senators Banks, Schneider, Kruse |