IN SB0263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Evidence preservation requirements. Establishes additional requirements for the disposition of property held as evidence that may contain biological evidence related to an offense, including matters involving postconviction DNA testing and analysis.
Title
Evidence preservation requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Sen. Rodney Pol [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] |
Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 89 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 260: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendment #1 (Schaibley) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Representative Dvorak added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Schaibley |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Koch removed as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senators Koch, Bohacek, Sandlin, Pol added as coauthors |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |