IN SB0263 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Representative Burton added as cosponsor
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specialized weapons training. Provides that, before an employee or any other staff member of a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school, may carry a firearm in or on school property as authorized by a school board of the school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school, the employee or staff member shall do the following: (1) Successfully complete certain specialized weapons training or other firearm training. (2) Provide proof to the school board that the employee or other staff member has successfully completed the training. (3) Complete the Minnesota multiphasic personality inventory 2 (MMPI-II) and provide the results from the inventory to the school board of the school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school. Establishes requirements for specialized weapons training. Requires an employee or any other staff member of a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school to successfully complete sixteen hours of weapons training each year that the employee or staff member is authorized and intends to carry a firearm in or on school property. Provides that the specialized weapons training must be provided by a person or entity approved by the school board of the school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school. Allows a school to barricade or block a door during an active shooter drill or during an active shooter emergency occurring in a school building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialized weapons training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Taylor G) failed (Y: 14 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseRepresentative Burton added as cosponsor
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateSenator Busch removed as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateCosponsor: Representative Morris
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Judy
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 42, nays 7
2020-02-03SenateSenator Busch added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #3 (Taylor G) failed; Roll Call 104: yeas 14, nays 35
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #1 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #5 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #4 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Crane added as third author
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13SenateSenator Garten added as second author
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback