IN SB0262 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Representative Huston added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Bonding for transportation projects. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (authority) may issue bonds or notes after April 30, 2017, for the construction of transportation projects. Provides that the total amount of all such bonds and notes issued by the authority after April 30, 2017, may not exceed $500,000,000. Specifies the maximum maturity of the bonds or notes. Provides that: (1) all or a part of the bonds or notes sold by the authority must first be offered to a pension fund administered by the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system, and the authority may sell the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonding for transportation projects. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (authority) may issue bonds or notes after April 30, 2017, for the construction of transportation projects. Provides that the total amount of all such bonds and notes issued by the authority after April 30, 2017, may not exceed $500,000,000. Specifies the maximum maturity of the bonds or notes. Provides that: (1) all or a part of the bonds or notes sold by the authority must first be offered to a pension fund administered by the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system, and the authority may sell the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseRepresentative Huston added as cosponsor
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-08SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-07SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Brown T
2017-02-07SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 41, nays 9
2017-02-06SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-26SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2017-01-10SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senators Tallian and Kenley

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback