IN SB0261 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Long term care insurance partnership program. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to apply before December 31, 2021, for a Medicaid state plan amendment to effectuate the federal long term care insurance partnership program (program). Requires the state plan amendment for the program to provide that the asset disregard for all policies entered into under the state's current long term insurance program will remain the same. Provides administrative, reporting, and continuing education requirements for the program. Requires a provider to provide health records upon request not more than 30 days after receiving the written request, unless the provider: (1) requests an extension of not more than 30 days in the initial 30 days; and (2) provides written notice to the patient of the reasons for the extension and the date by which the provider will provide the health records. Authorizes the state department of health to impose a civil penalty of not more than $5,000 per violation on a provider that violates the requirement to provide health records upon request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long term care insurance partnership program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2021-02-23SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-22SenateCosponsor: Representative Heaton
2021-02-22SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
2021-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14SenateSenator Grooms added as second author
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Walker G

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/261/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/e/1/a9e1bd9a/SB0261.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/f/8/50f878f0/SB0261.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/5/1/43515b3f/SB0261.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/9/c/639c1dd3/SB0261.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/7/4/5974311c/SB0261.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/6/1/1e61b9e5/SB0261.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/1/0/3810399b/SB0261.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/8/7/92873b0f/SB0261.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/c/f/12cfe92d/SB0261.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/8/f/6a8f3825/SB0261.155_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback