IN SB0259 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows discussion of strategy with respect to school consolidation to be conducted in an executive session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School consolidation executive session.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Signed by the Governor
2012-02-29 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-02-27 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-02-27 Signed by the Speaker
2012-02-21 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2012-02-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 62, nays 31
2012-02-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-14 Representative Neese added as cosponsor
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2012-01-31 Cosponsors: Reps. Truitt and Klinker
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Dermody
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 46 and nays 4
2012-01-30 Senator Skinner added as coauthor
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback