IN SB0258 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter safety. Requires the board of firefighting personnel standards and education to establish best practices to improve safety and health outcomes for firefighters. Establishes the best practices fund for the purpose of providing matching grants to political subdivisions and volunteer fire departments to purchase equipment and other gear to implement best practices. Provides that the worker's compensation rating bureau of Indiana may recommend a premium or rate discount toward worker's compensation insurance to political subdivisions and volunteer fire departments that implement best practices.
Title
Firefighter safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 72 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 351: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 353: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Bartels, Barrett and Chyung |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Frye R and Klinker |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crider and Melton |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Mrvan |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Lauer added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Frye R) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Bartels added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |