IN SB0258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 220
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sex offender employment and residence. Allows a court to prohibit, as a condition of probation, a sexually violent predator or an offender against children from having: (1) unsupervised contact; or (2) contact; with a child less than 16 years of age. Requires that as a condition of probation, a court shall inform an offender against children of the restrictions on an offender against children residing near: (1) school property; (2) a youth program center; (3) a public park; or (4) the residence of the victim of the offender's sex offense. Prohibits a sexually violent predator or an offender against children from working: (1) as or for a child care provider; (2) as a provider of respite care services and other support services for primary or family caregivers; or (3) as a provider of adult day care services. Prohibits an offender against children from residing in a residence where a person provides child care services, or within 1,000 feet of a licensed day care center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offender employment and residence. Allows a court to prohibit, as a condition of probation, a sexually violent predator or an offender against children from having: (1) unsupervised contact; or (2) contact; with a child less than 16 years of age. Requires that as a condition of probation, a court shall inform an offender against children of the restrictions on an offender against children residing near: (1) school property; (2) a youth program center; (3) a public park; or (4) the residence of the victim of the offender's sex offense. Prohibits a sexually violent predator or an offender against children from working: (1) as or for a child care provider; (2) as a provider of respite care services and other support services for primary or family caregivers; or (3) as a provider of adult day care services. Prohibits an offender against children from residing in a residence where a person provides child care services, or within 1,000 feet of a licensed day care center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Jackson) prevailed (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 220
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 611: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 570: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Young J, Hatfield and Summers
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Manning and Jackson
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Young M, Breaux, Mrvan and Crane
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Ford J.D.
2019-04-11SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-11SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-11SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2019-04-02SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-25HouseRepresentative Jackson added as cosponsor
2019-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-03-21HouseAmendment #3 (Jackson) prevailed; Roll Call 334: yeas 78, nays 14
2019-03-21HouseAmendment #2 (Hatfield) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2019-02-19HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as cosponsor
2019-02-15SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-14SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Manning
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-22SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSenators Randolph and Merritt added as coauthors
2019-01-22SenateSenator Young M added as third author
2019-01-22SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-14SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Head added as second author
2019-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Mrvan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/258/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/0/d/610dc708/SB0258.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/8/3/e98322af/SB0258.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/c/7/1fc70108/SB0258.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/5/4/bd54cc12/SB0258.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/b/7/d6b7fe7d/SB0258.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/0/b/f40b5e83/SB0258.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/6/1/5b61877b/SB0258.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/f/0/46f0770a/SB0258.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/4/5/92456f42/SB0258.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/a/f/76af0111/SB0258.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/e/a/b3ea7e77/SB0258.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/6/e/dc6e8a26/SB0258.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/3/5/03359d9f/SB0258.110.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/d/d/cfdd0c56/SB0258.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/d/2/b6d2def9/SB0258.334.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/c/4/8cc48767/SB0258.340.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/9/6/0196e8c3/SB0258.570.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/1/b/6c1b819d/SB0258.611.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback