IN SB0258 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission) to establish an alcohol server trainer program. Requires the commission to approve alcohol server trainer programs by third parties. (Current law allows the commission to approve alcohol server trainer programs by third parties.) Establishes requirements for alcohol server trainer programs. Requires the commission to post all of the approved alcohol server trainer programs and alcohol server programs on the commission's Internet web site. Removes provisions that: (1) prohibit the commission from approving alcohol server trainer programs by third parties that hold or have an interest in certain alcoholic beverage permits; and (2) establish factors the commission may consider in approving an alcohol server trainer program.
Title
Alcohol trainer programs and server programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Simpson added as coauthor | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Davis | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators Alting and Arnold |