IN SB0257 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Employee misclassification. Requires the department of state revenue, the state department of labor, the worker's compensation board of Indiana, and the department of workforce development to report before November 1 of each year for three years, beginning November 1, 2021, to the interim study committee on employment and labor for the immediately preceding state fiscal year: (1) the number of employers that each department or the board determined during the immediately preceding state fiscal year improperly classified at least one worker as an independent contractor; (2) the total number of improperly classified workers employed by those employers; (3) the department's or board's calculation of actual revenue not collected or the additional costs to the state that the department or board attributes to the improperly classified workers; (4) the amount of the penalties and interest assessed against those employers by each department or the board, and the amount of the penalties and interest assessed that has been collected; and (5) the classification criteria used by the department to classify workers. Requires that the reports include only information in the form of aggregate statistics and not include information that can be used to identify specific employers or workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee misclassification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2021-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-15SenateSenators Taylor G, Melton, Lanane, Yoder added as coauthors
2021-02-15SenateSenators Qaddoura, Tallian, Ford J.D. added as coauthors
2021-02-15SenateSenator Bohacek added as third author
2021-02-15SenateCosponsors: Representatives Hatfield and Bauer M
2021-02-15SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Karickhoff
2021-02-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-09SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenator Holdman added as second author
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Niezgodski

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/257/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/7/4/1e746c7a/SB0257.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/4/4/a944d894/SB0257.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/a/3/89a3f3a2/SB0257.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/b/6/d2b6b05d/SB0257.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/b/9/8fb90e8c/SB0257.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/1/0/4510df4d/SB0257.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/3/b/be3bc041/SB0257.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/0/6/90062877/SB0257.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/7/e/127e8253/SB0257.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/0/4/f304ad3f/SB0257.109_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback