IN SB0256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the name of the correctional peace officer's fund to the correctional professionals assistance fund of Indiana ("fund"). Provides that payment of monetary assistance from the fund is subject to the approval of the commissioner. Adds catastrophic events, as determined by the commissioner, to the list of purposes for which monetary assistance may be paid from the fund. Makes a technical correction to delete a reference to a repealed statute.
Title
Correctional professionals assistance fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-20 | Representatives Klinker and L. Lawson added as cosponsors | |
2012-02-20 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Steuerwald | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Dermody | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-20 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators Wyss and Arnold |